blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0136833

Designated contracting statesDE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
NL 
Examination procedure21.11.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.08.1986M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.198603   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.04.1985 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:19.02.1986 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:13.05.1987 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:19861020
 
Event date:08.08.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:BOLWELL, CAMPBELL ROBERT