Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0136833

EP0136833 - Simulator device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.1987
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOLWELL DEVELOPMENTS PTY. LTD.
Wells & Boundary Roads Mordialloc
Victoria 3195 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1985/15]For all designated states
BOLWELL DEVELOPMENTS PTY. LTD.
Wells & Boundary Roads
Mordialloc Victoria 3195 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Bolwell, Campbell Robert
Browns Road
Cranbourne South Victoria / AU
[1985/15]
Representative(s)Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/15]Keltie, David Arthur , et al
Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date84306022.903.09.1984
[1985/15]
Priority number, dateAU1983000120502.09.1983         Original published format: AU 120583
[1985/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0136833
Date:10.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0136833
Date:19.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1985
ClassificationInternational:A63G31/16, G09B9/08
[1985/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/15]
TitleGerman:Simulationsvorrichtung[1985/15]
English:Simulator device[1985/15]
French:Installation de simulation[1985/15]
File destroyed:27.05.1993
Examination procedure20.10.1986Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/20]
21.11.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.08.1986M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.198603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3645011  (CALLANEN OLIVER E);
 [X]BE479125  ;
 [X]CH443998  (SAIKO ALPHONS [CH], et al);
 [X]US3618256  (MONKS FRANK E);
 [A]US4066256  (TRUMBULL DOUGLAS);
 [A]US3304628  (LOUIS KAPLAN);
 [A]US2453436  (BEN HERTZ);
 [A]DE1225738  (STARKSTROM APPBAU G M B H);
 [A]FR2516296  (SOVITEC SA [FR])