Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0138494

EP0138494 - Ignition apparatus for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.08.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/17]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashizume, Atsushi
1344-684, Uchikoshi
City of Himeji Hyogo Prefecture / JP
[1985/17]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]Mounteney, Simon James , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [1985/17]Lawson, David Glynne
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date84306677.028.09.1984
[1985/17]
Priority number, dateJP1983018185828.09.1983         Original published format: JP 18185883
[1985/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0138494
Date:24.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0138494
Date:30.04.1986
Language:EN
[1986/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0138494
Date:15.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0138494
Date:09.10.1996
Language:EN
[1996/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1986
ClassificationInternational:F02P7/02
[1985/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/17]
TitleGerman:Zündgeräte für Brennkraftmaschinen[1985/30]
English:Ignition apparatus for internal combustion engines[1985/17]
French:Dispositif d'allumage pour moteurs à combustion interne[1985/30]
Examination procedure28.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/27]
14.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.1989Fee for grant paid
07.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.08.1990  05.09.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/40]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.1990  05.09.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
20.09.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.04.1991Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
13.08.1991Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
22.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.10.1993Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.12.1995Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.04.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.07.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.12.1993Appeal received No.  T0005/94
14.02.1994Statement of grounds filed
12.12.1995Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
12.12.1995Date of oral proceedings
21.12.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP56050263  ;
 [A]JP58057071  ;
 [A]US4208992  ;
 [A]US4104997  ;
 [A]GB2022701  ;
 [A]FR2384386  ;
 [A]DE2925344  ;
 [A]US4347827
 [AD]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 108 (M-78) [780], 14th July 1981, page 40 M 78; & JP - A - 56 050 263 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 07-05-1981, & JP56050263 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 145 (M-244) [1290], 24th June 1983; & JP - A - 58 057 071 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 05-04-1983, & JP58057071 A 00000000