blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0138516

EP0138516 - Centrifugal compressor wheel and its mounting on a shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/17]Centrifugal compressor apparatus
[1985/25]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.05.1986
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOUSEHOLD MANUFACTURING, INC.
2700 Sanders Road Prospect Heights
Illinois 60070 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/17]For all designated states
HOUSEHOLD MANUFACTURING, INC.
2700 Sanders Road
Prospect Heights Illinois 60070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Elliott, Gene Paul
2 West 73rd Street
Indianapolis Indiana 46260 / US
[1985/17]
Representative(s)Massey, Alexander, et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
[1985/17]
Application number, filing date84306755.404.10.1984
[1985/17]
Priority number, dateUS1983054012207.10.1983         Original published format: US 540122
[1985/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0138516
Date:24.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1985
ClassificationIPC:F04D29/28, F01D5/06
[1985/17]
CPC:
F01D5/025 (EP); F04D29/266 (EP); F04D29/284 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1985/17]
TitleGerman:Laufrad eines Zentrifugalkompressors und seine Montage an der Welle[1985/25]
English:Centrifugal compressor wheel and its mounting on a shaft[1985/25]
French:Roue de compresseur centrifuge et son montage sur l'arbre[1985/25]
Former [1985/17]Centrifugal compressor apparatus
File destroyed:14.12.1992
Examination procedure30.12.1985Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1986/27]
28.01.1986Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1986/27]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3961867  ;
 [Y]US4340317  ;
 [A]GB655880  ;
 [XE]EP0129311
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.