blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0144232

EP0144232 - Automatic weighing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.1990
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.1990 [1990/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA ISHIDA KOKI SEISAKUSHO
44, Shogoin Sannou-cho Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 606 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/24]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA ISHIDA KOKI SEISAKUSHO
44, Shogoin Sannou-cho Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tokutsu, Harunori
Rune Ohtsu 11-409 2, 2-chome, Nionohama
Ohtsu-shi Shiga / JP
[1985/24]
Representative(s)Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/24]Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London, WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date84308384.103.12.1984
[1985/24]
Priority number, dateJP1983022869703.12.1983         Original published format: JP 22869783
[1985/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0144232
Date:12.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0144232
Date:23.04.1986
Language:EN
[1986/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0144232
Date:11.10.1989
Language:EN
[1989/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.1986
ClassificationIPC:G01G3/14, G01G13/00, G01G21/22, G01G13/24
[1986/10]
CPC:
G01G13/003 (EP); G01G19/393 (EP); G01G21/22 (EP);
G01G3/1414 (EP)
Former IPC [1985/24]G01G3/14, G01G13/24, G01G21/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/24]
TitleGerman:Automatischer Wiegeapparat[1985/31]
English:Automatic weighing apparatus[1985/24]
French:Dispositif de pesage automatique[1985/31]
Examination procedure10.09.1986Examination requested  [1986/45]
23.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.1989Fee for grant paid
04.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38]
Request for further processing for:16.09.1988Request for further processing filed
05.09.1988Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.10.1988Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2003284  ;
 [A]FR2492095  ;
 [A]DE3205799  ;
 [A]DE2906669  ;
 [A]EP0072707  ;
 [A]DE1800688
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.