Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0147992

EP0147992 - Multi-driver loudspeaker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.1989
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
8500 Balboa Drive, P.O. Box 2200 Northridge
California 91329 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/28]For all designated states
HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
8500 Balboa Drive, P.O. Box 2200
Northridge California 91329 / US
Inventor(s)01 / House, William Neal
1600 N. Willis 227
Bloomington Indiana 47401 / US
[1985/28]
Representative(s)Barlow, Roy James , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/28]Barlow, Roy James , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date84308815.417.12.1984
[1985/28]
Priority number, dateUS1983056546427.12.1983         Original published format: US 565464
[1985/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0147992
Date:10.07.1985
Language:EN
[1985/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0147992
Date:16.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0147992
Date:19.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.08.1985
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/24, H04R23/02
[1985/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/28]
TitleGerman:Lautsprecher mit mehreren Antrieben[1985/28]
English:Multi-driver loudspeaker[1985/28]
French:Haut-parleur à plusiers moteurs[1985/28]
Examination procedure26.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/23]
28.01.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.04.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.1988Fee for grant paid
11.07.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.12.1988
[1999/52]
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP57123798  ;
 [X]EP0095876  (HARMAN INT IND [US]);
 [X]US2593031  (HOWATT GLENN N);
 [A]US3392730  (CARLO RELLI);
 [A]FR2232899  (GIRARD RENE [FR])
 [Y]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 218 (E-139)[1096], 2nd November 1982; & JP - A - 57 123 798 (SANYO DENKI K.K.) 02-08-1982, & JP57123798 A 00000000