blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0127523

EP0127523 - Electron-cyclotron resonance ion source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.07.1989 [1989/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31/33, rue de la Fédération
75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1988/03]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31/33, rue de la Fédération
F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Former [1984/49]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel
31/33, rue de la Fédération
F-75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Delaunay, Marc
38, Avenue Jeanne d'Arc
F-38100 Grenoble / FR
02 / Gualandris, René
14, Avenue Malherbe
F-38100 Grenoble / FR
03 / Geller, Richard
4, Place Grenette
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
04 / Jaquot, Claude
40, Rue Saint Robert
F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR
05 / Ludwig, Paul
1 Bis, Chemin Vulcain
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
06 / Mathonnet, Jean-Marc
14, rue George Sand
F-38100 Grenoble / FR
07 / Rocco, Jean-Claude
Bouveyres
F-38640 Claix / FR
08 / Sermet, Pierre
6, Place Jean Moulin
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
09 / Zadworny, Francois
8, Avenue Charles de Foucauld
F-38700 Corenc / FR
10 / Bourg, Francois
22, rue du Bois Meutel
F-38400 Saint Mertin d'Heres / FR
[1984/49]
Representative(s)Mongrédien, André, et al
c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1984/49]
Application number, filing date84401014.017.05.1984
[1984/49]
Priority number, dateFR1983000840120.05.1983         Original published format: FR 8308401
[1984/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0127523
Date:05.12.1984
Language:FR
[1984/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0127523
Date:10.08.1988
Language:FR
[1988/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1984
ClassificationIPC:H01J27/18
[1984/49]
CPC:
H01J27/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   NL,   SE [1984/49]
TitleGerman:Elektronzyklotronresonanz-Ionenquelle[1984/49]
English:Electron-cyclotron resonance ion source[1984/49]
French:Source d'ions à résonance cyclotronique des électrons[1984/49]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure08.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/29]
17.12.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.05.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
08.12.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.1988Fee for grant paid
28.01.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL10.08.1988
[1989/12]
Documents cited:Search[AD]  - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, vol. 196, no. 2/3, mai 1982, Amsterdam (NL), F. BOURG et al.:"Source d'ions multicharges minimafios. Nouvelles caractéristiques", pages 325-329
 [A]  - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS, vol. 127, 15 août 1975, North-Holland Publishing Company, Amsterdam (NL) P. BRIAND et al.:"Production and abundance measurements of multicharged xenon ions in ECR produced plasmas", pages 441-443
 [A]  - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 11, no. 5, mai 1972, Tokyo (JP) Y. OKAMOTO et al.:"Some features of an electron cyclotron resonance plasma produced by means of a Lisitano-coil", pages 726-731
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.