blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0127525

EP0127525 - Method and apparatus for coding at a small cost data flow for television systems with conditional replenishment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
[1984/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Catros, Jean-Yves
THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann
F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR
[1984/49]
Representative(s)Lincot, Georges, et al
Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1984/49]Lincot, Georges, et al
THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud
F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date84401024.918.05.1984
[1984/49]
Priority number, dateFR1983000882727.05.1983         Original published format: FR 8308827
[1984/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0127525
Date:05.12.1984
Language:FR
[1984/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.1984
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/13
[1984/49]
CPC:
H04N19/124 (EP,US); H04N19/50 (EP,US); H04N19/503 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1984/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kodieren mit geringen Datenflusskosten für Fernsehsysteme mit konditioneller Auffrischung[1984/49]
English:Method and apparatus for coding at a small cost data flow for television systems with conditional replenishment[1984/49]
French:Procédé et dispositif de codage à faible coût en débit de données pour systèmes de télévision à rafraîchissement conditionnel[1984/49]
File destroyed:28.05.1993
Examination procedure02.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/29]
24.11.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.1987Application withdrawn by applicant  [1988/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3761613  (LIMB J);
 [Y]US3825832  (VETTIGER P, et al);
 [Y]US3553362  (MOUNTS FRANK W);
 [A]US4006297  (KOGA TOSHIO)
 [Y]  - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 30, no. 3, mars 1977, pages 245-250, Berlin, DE; H. WENDT: "Schmalband-Codierung"
 [Y]  - FREQUENZ, vol. 33, no. 1, janvier 1979, pages 3-8, Berlin, DE; G. BOSTELMANN: "Ein Codec für Bildfernsprechsignale mit subjecktiv optimiertem Bewegungsdetektor"
 [A]  - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 15, no. 5, 1 mars 1979, pages 142-144, Hitchin, GB; T.J. TENNIS: "Quantiser selection for interframe differential pulse code modulation of television pictures"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.