blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0143023

EP0143023 - Casing for the magnetic circuit of ignition transformers for vehicles and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/22]Magnetic circuit for an ignition transformer
[1987/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.1988
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.1988Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 01.02.1989 [1989/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DUCELLIER ET CIE
3/5 Voie Félix Eboué
F-94000 Creteil / FR
[1985/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Bonnefoy, Jean Claude
Olagnier
F-63590 Cunlhat / FR
[1985/22]
Representative(s)Habert, Roger
VALEO Service Propriété Industrielle 21 rue Auguste Blanqui
F-93406 Saint-Ouen / FR
[1986/08]
Former [1985/22]Habert, Roger
VALEO Service Propriété Industrielle 21 rue Auguste Blanqui
F-93406 Saint Ouen / FR
Application number, filing date84401999.205.10.1984
[1985/22]
Priority number, dateFR1983001870324.11.1983         Original published format: FR 8318703
[1985/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0143023
Date:29.05.1985
Language:FR
[1985/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0143023
Date:23.09.1987
Language:FR
[1987/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.1985
ClassificationIPC:H01F27/26
[1985/22]
CPC:
H01F27/263 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/22]
TitleGerman:Klemmbügel für den magnetischen Kreis für eine Kraftfahrzeugzündspule und Verfahren zur Herstellung[1987/39]
English:Casing for the magnetic circuit of ignition transformers for vehicles and method for manufacturing the same[1987/39]
French:Bride de maintien du circuit magnétique d'une bobine d'allumage pour véhicule automobile et procédé d'obtention d'une telle bride[1987/39]
Former [1985/22]Magnetischer Kreis für eine Zündspule
Former [1985/22]Magnetic circuit for an ignition transformer
Former [1985/22]Circuit magnétique pour bobine d'allumage
Examination procedure25.06.1985Examination requested  [1985/38]
03.06.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.03.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.1987Fee for grant paid
13.05.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.06.1988No opposition filed within time limit [1988/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL23.09.1987
[1989/05]
Documents cited:SearchUS3348276  [ ];
 FR1180873  [ ];
 DE959033  [ ];
 DE1192759  [ ];
 US4024486  [ ];
 FR2438327  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.