Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0145558

EP0145558 - Galenic forms of sulpiride for oral administration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1990
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.1991 [1991/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE D'ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES DE L'ILE-DE-FRANCE
46, Boulevard de Latour-Maubourg
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1987/04]For all designated states
SOCIETE D'ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES DE L'ILE-DE-FRANCE
46, Boulevard de Latour-Maubourg
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Former [1985/25]For all designated states
ETHYPHARM
21, rue Saint-Matthieu
F-78550 Houdan / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Debregeas, Patrice
10 rue du Peintre Lebrun
F-78000 Versailles / FR
[1985/25]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1988/24]
Former [1987/04]Gallochat, Alain
SOCIETE D'ETUDES SCIENTIFIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES DE L'ILE DE FRANCE 46, Boulevard de Latour Maubourg
F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Former [1986/08]Pinguet, André
Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart
F-75016 Paris / FR
Former [1985/25]Pinguet, André
CAPRI 28 bis, avenue Mozart
F-75016 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date84402308.513.11.1984
[1985/25]
Priority number, dateFR1983001800314.11.1983         Original published format: FR 8318003
[1985/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0145558
Date:19.06.1985
Language:FR
[1985/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0145558
Date:07.08.1985
Language:FR
[1985/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0145558
Date:31.01.1990
Language:FR
[1990/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.1985
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/54, A61K31/40
[1985/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/25]
TitleGerman:Galenische Formen des Sulpirids zur oralen Verabreichung[1985/25]
English:Galenic forms of sulpiride for oral administration[1985/25]
French:Nouvelles formes galéniques du sulpiride utilisables par voie orale[1985/25]
Examination procedure29.11.1985Examination requested  [1986/07]
22.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
18.05.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.06.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.1989Fee for grant paid
26.07.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
07.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2454804  (SANOFI SA);
 [X]WO8201649  (DESHORS [FR], et al);
 [X]EP0040590  (HAESSLE AB [SE]);
 [XP]EP0107557  (LARUELLE CLAUDE);
 [YD]FR2453642  (SANOFI SA)