blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0144274

EP0144274 - Process for preparing cheese-flavoured products, and products obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.11.1990
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paillier, Jean-Claude
Bois de la Loge Puyreaux
16230 Mansle / FR
[N/P]
Former [1985/24]For all designated states
Paillier, Jean-Claude
Bois de la Loge Puyreaux
F-16230 Mansle / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1985/24]
Representative(s)Phélip, Bruno, et al
Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1985/24]Phélip, Bruno, et al
c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date84402504.905.12.1984
[1985/24]
Priority number, dateFR1983001950206.12.1983         Original published format: FR 8319502
[1985/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0144274
Date:12.06.1985
Language:FR
[1985/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0144274
Date:01.06.1988
Language:FR
[1988/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.1985
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/23, A23C19/028, A23C19/032, A23C19/086
[1985/24]
CPC:
A23C19/086 (EP); A23C19/028 (EP); A23C19/076 (EP);
A23C9/1234 (EP); A23C9/1236 (EP); A23L27/25 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Produkten mit Käsegeschmack und die mittels dieses Verfahrens hergestellten Produkte[1985/24]
English:Process for preparing cheese-flavoured products, and products obtained by this process[1985/24]
French:Procédé de préparation de produits à saveur de fromage, et produits obtenus par ce procédé[1985/24]
Examination procedure06.12.1985Examination requested  [1986/10]
12.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
04.12.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.1988Fee for grant paid
10.02.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.1989   
Krayer, Warner Dirk
c/o Koninklijke Nederlandse Zuivelbond FNZ Volmerlaan 7
NL-2280 HV Rijswijk (ZH) / NL
Opponent's representative
Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al, et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1989/19]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.1989   
Krayer, Warner Dirk
c/o Koninklijke Nederlandse Zuivelbond FNZ Volmerlaan 7
NL-2280 HV Rijswijk (ZH) / NL
Opponent's representative
Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al, et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
22.06.1989Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.07.1990Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
28.07.1990Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU31.12.1988
AT05.12.1989
GB05.12.1989
SE06.12.1989
BE31.12.1989
CH31.12.1989
LI31.12.1989
NL01.07.1990
[2002/40]
Former [2002/02]CH01.06.1988
LI01.06.1988
LU31.12.1988
AT05.12.1989
GB05.12.1989
SE06.12.1989
BE31.12.1989
NL01.07.1990
Former [1999/52]LU31.12.1988
AT05.12.1989
GB05.12.1989
SE06.12.1989
BE31.12.1989
CH31.12.1989
LI31.12.1989
NL01.07.1990
Former [1991/17]AT05.12.1989
GB05.12.1989
SE06.12.1989
BE31.12.1989
CH31.12.1989
LI31.12.1989
NL01.07.1990
Former [1991/11]GB05.12.1989
SE06.12.1989
CH31.12.1989
LI31.12.1989
Former [1991/08]SE06.12.1989
CH31.12.1989
LI31.12.1989
Former [1990/39]SE06.12.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]SU959738  ;
 [A]SU608513  ;
 [XD]AU41206  ;
 [XD]US2009135  (GRELCK WILLIAM P M);
 [A]FR2014742  (UNILEVER NV);
 [A]BE780587Q  (BEATRICE FOODS CO);
 [XD]DE2545847  (VOSS EBERHARD)
 [A]  - FOOD SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ABSTRACTS, no. 84-02-P0441 (84011217); & SU - A - 959 738 (F. FEDIN) 1982, & SU959738 A 00000000
 [A]  - FOOD SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ABSTRACTS, no. 79-11-H1785 (79061493); & SU - A - 608 513 (N. KOROLEVA) 1982, & SU608513 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.