Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0136248

EP0136248 - Capacitive pressure transducer signal conditioning circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.1990
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.1990 [1990/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/14]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Male, Barry Jon
29 Day Street South
West Granby Connecticut 06090 / US
[1985/14]
Representative(s)Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1985/14]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date84630124.028.08.1984
[1985/14]
Priority number, dateUS1983052753029.08.1983         Original published format: US 527530
[1985/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0136248
Date:03.04.1985
Language:EN
[1985/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0136248
Date:26.03.1986
Language:EN
[1986/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0136248
Date:05.04.1989
Language:EN
[1989/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1986
ClassificationInternational:G01L9/12
[1985/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1985/14]
TitleGerman:Ansteuerschaltung für kapazitive Druckwandler[1989/14]
English:Capacitive pressure transducer signal conditioning circuit[1985/14]
French:Circuit de conditionnement du signal d'un transducteur capacitif de pression[1985/14]
Former [1985/14]Signal-Konditionierungsstromkreis für kapazitive Druckwandler
Examination procedure12.09.1986Examination requested  [1986/47]
30.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1988Fee for grant paid
16.12.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4392382  ;
 [A]WO8203694