Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0133164

EP0133164 - Compounds which can be copolymerised [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.1989
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.1989 [1989/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
4002 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1985/07]For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Slongo, Mario, Dr.
Sägetrainweg 553
CH-1712 Tafers / CH
02 / Rody, Jean, Dr.
Rütiring 82
CH-4125 Riehen / CH
[1985/07]
Application number, filing date84810357.820.07.1984
[1985/07]
Priority number, dateCH1983000408726.07.1983         Original published format: CH 408783
[1985/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0133164
Date:13.02.1985
Language:DE
[1985/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0133164
Date:25.06.1986
Language:DE
[1986/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0133164
Date:14.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.1986
ClassificationInternational:C07D249/20, C08K5/34
[1985/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1985/07]
TitleGerman:Copolymerisierbare Verbindungen[1985/07]
English:Compounds which can be copolymerised[1985/07]
French:Dérivés copolymérisables[1985/07]
Examination procedure23.07.1984Examination requested  [1985/07]
19.01.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.02.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1988Fee for grant paid
26.08.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0031302  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [YD]EP0057160  ;
 [A]DE1217383  (GEIGY AG J R [CH])