blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0122893

EP0122893 - Excavating tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  24.05.1995
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Santrade Ltd.
Alpenquai 12 P.O. Box 321
CH-6002 Luzern / CH
[N/P]
Former [1985/04]For all designated states
Santrade Ltd.
Alpenquai 12 P.O. Box 321
CH-6002 Luzern / CH
Former [1984/43]For all designated states
Santrade Limited
Alpenquai 12 P.O. Box 321
CH-6002 Luzern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Larsson, Kenneth
Gävlevägen 64B
S-811 32 Sandviken / SE
02 / Levefelt, Bert
Ekostigen 24
S-811 37 Sandviken / SE
[1984/43]
Representative(s)Lieke, Winfried, et al
WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/43]Lieke, Winfried, Dr., et al
Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr., Postfach 61 45
D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [1986/33]Eriksson, Kjell
Sandvik AB Patent Department
S-811 81 Sandviken / SE
Former [1984/43]Forsberg, Lars-Ake
Sandvik AB Central Services Patents and Licences
S-811 81 Sandviken / SE
Application number, filing date84850079.912.03.1984
[1984/43]
Priority number, dateSE1983000158423.03.1983         Original published format: SE 8301584
[1984/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0122893
Date:24.10.1984
Language:EN
[1984/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0122893
Date:08.02.1989
Language:EN
[1989/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.1984
ClassificationIPC:E21C35/18
[1984/43]
CPC:
E21B10/56 (EP,US); B28D1/186 (EP,US); B28D1/188 (EP,US);
E21C35/183 (EP,US); E21C35/1837 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1984/43]
TitleGerman:Schrämpicke[1984/43]
English:Excavating tool[1984/43]
French:Pic d'une tête de coupe[1984/43]
Examination procedure04.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/21]
12.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.11.1987Fee for grant paid
20.11.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.09.1989  13.12.1989  ADMISSIBLE
BETEK Bergbau- und Hartmetalltechnik K.H. Simon GmbH & Co.KG
Sulgener Strasse
D-78733 Aichhalden / DE
Opponent's representative
Vogel, Georg
Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35
71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
 02  08.11.1989  26.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Kennametal Inc.
One Lloyd Avenue
Latrobe, Pa. 15650 / US
Opponent's representative
Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz
Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
 03  08.11.1989  26.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
GTE Service Corporation
100 Endicott St.
Danvers MA 01923 / US
Opponent's representative
Meyer-Plath, Henning
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/01]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.1989  13.12.1989  ADMISSIBLE
BETEK Bergbau- und Hartmetalltechnik K.H. Simon GmbH & Co.KG
Sulgener Strasse
D-78733 Aichhalden / DE
Opponent's representative
Vogel, Georg
Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35
D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
 02  08.11.1989  26.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Kennametal Inc.
One Lloyd Avenue
Latrobe, Pa. 15650 / US
Opponent's representative
Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7
D-81241 München / DE
 03  08.11.1989  26.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
GTE Service Corporation
100 Endicott St.
Danvers MA 01923 / US
Opponent's representative
Meyer-Plath, Henning, Dr.-Ing.
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1989/43]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.1989  13.12.1989  ADMISSIBLE
BETEK Bergbau- und Hartmetalltechnik K.H. Simon GmbH & Co.KG
Sulgener Strasse
D-78733 Aichhalden / DE
Opponent's representative
Vogel, Georg
Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35
D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
01.03.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.08.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.09.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
09.11.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
11.07.1991Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.11.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/28]
Appeal following opposition02.09.1991Appeal received No.  T0674/91
07.11.1991Statement of grounds filed
28.05.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1993/22]
30.11.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
30.11.1994Date of oral proceedings
12.12.1994Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]SU829917  ;
 [Y]GB1601470  (WIMET LTD);
 [Y]US3239275  (PIERRE BELUGOU);
 [Y]US4108260  (BOZARTH REX O);
 [A]DE2846744  (WALLRAM HARTMETALL GMBH)
 [Y]  - Soviet Inventions Illustrated week E 08, 7 April 1982 section Q 49 & SU-A-829917, & SU829917 A 00000000
 [Y]  - GLÜCKAUF, vol. 117, no. 18, September 1981, Bochum (D) D. PLUM et al. "Schneidende Gewinnung auf der Bergbau 81", pages 1167-1169
Examination   - GLÜCKAUF, vol. 117, September 1981, Bochum (DE), D. PLUM et al. "Schneidende Gewinnung auf der Bergbau 81", pages 1167-1169
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.