Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0140941

EP0140941 - ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE-COATED SHEET MATERIAL FOR MOIST SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.1988
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/20]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SNYDER, William, R.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US
02 / SPENCE, Cheryl, L.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133 / US
[1985/20]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/20]Baillie, Iain Cameron , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date84901684.506.04.1984
[1985/20]
WO1984US00506
Priority number, dateUS1983048299107.04.1983         Original published format: US 482991
[1985/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8403837
Date:11.10.1984
[1984/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0140941
Date:15.05.1985
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.1984
[1985/20]
Search report(s)
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/06, C09J3/14, C08L33/08, C08F299/02
[1985/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/20]
TitleGerman:KLEBEMITTEL UND DAMIT ÜBERZOGENES BANDFÖRMIGES MATERIAL FÜR FEUCHTE HAUT[1985/20]
English:ADHESIVE AND ADHESIVE-COATED SHEET MATERIAL FOR MOIST SKIN[1985/20]
French:ADHESIF ET MATERIAU EN FEUILLE ENDUIT D'ADHESIF POUR LA PEAU MOUILLEE[1985/20]
File destroyed:09.08.1994
Entry into regional phase02.01.1985National basic fee paid 
02.01.1985Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.1985Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/31]
31.10.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/25]
18.01.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1988/25]
18.01.1988Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.198704   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational searchUS4077926  [ ];
 FR2178760  [ ];
 DE1934710  [ ];
 US3121021  [ ];
 USRE24906E  [ ]