Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0149612

EP0149612 - TUBULAR CONNECTION WITH CYLINDRICAL AND TAPERED STEPPED THREADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.04.1989
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.1989Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYDRIL COMPANY
714 West Olympic Boulevard Los Angeles
California 90015 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/31]For all designated states
HYDRIL COMPANY
714 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angeles California 90015 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LANDRIAULT, L., Steven
15809 Lakeview
Houston, TX 77040 / US
[1985/31]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/31]Baillie, Iain Cameron , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date84901692.809.04.1984
[1985/31]
WO1984US00520
Priority number, dateUS1983048863326.04.1983         Original published format: US 488633
US1983048877826.04.1983         Original published format: US 488778
[1985/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO8404352
Date:08.11.1984
[1984/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0149612
Date:31.07.1985
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.1984
[1985/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0149612
Date:15.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/24]
Search report(s)
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/042, F16L15/00
[1985/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/31]
TitleGerman:ROHRVERBINDUNG MIT ZYLINDRISCHEN UND SPITZ ZULAUFENDEN ABGESTUFTEN GEWINDEN[1985/31]
English:TUBULAR CONNECTION WITH CYLINDRICAL AND TAPERED STEPPED THREADS[1985/31]
French:CONNEXION TUBULAIRE AVEC FILETAGES EN GRADINS CYLINDRIQUES ET CONIQUES[1985/31]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1984National basic fee paid 
28.12.1984Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.1985Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.1985Examination requested  [1985/31]
25.02.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.1986Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
13.11.1987Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.1988Fee for grant paid
02.02.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.03.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
07.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH15.06.1988
LI15.06.1988
SE30.06.1988
[1989/27]
Former [1989/23]SE30.06.1988
Cited inInternational searchUS4192533  [ ] (BLOSE THOMAS L [US]);
 US4373754  [ ] (BOLLFRASS CHARLES A, et al);
 US3989284  [ ] (BLOSE THOMAS L);
 US4244607  [ ] (BLOSE THOMAS L);
 US4253687  [ ] (MAPLES JOHN H);
 US4009893  [ ] (SCHATTON PAUL, et al);
 US2211179  [ ] (STONE ALBERT L);
 US3224799  [ ] (BLOSE THOMAS L, et al)
by applicantUS4192533
 US3989284