EP0146597 - PLANT FOR THE OZONATION OF A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAEDERACH- ZAUGG, Barbara Kranichweg 30 CH-3074 Muri / CH | [1985/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Clarence Paul Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Feldmann, Clarence Paul c/o Patentanwaltsbüro FELDMANN AG Postfach Kanalstrasse 17 CH-8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 84902329.6 | 15.06.1984 | [1985/27] | WO1984CH00097 | Priority number, date | CH19830003352 | 20.06.1983 Original published format: CH 335283 | [1985/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8500161 | Date: | 17.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0146597 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146597 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/78 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C01B13/11 (EP,US);
C01B2201/14 (EP,US);
C01B2201/60 (EP,US);
C01B2201/76 (EP,US);
C02F2201/782 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM OZONISIEREN EINES FLUIDS | [1985/27] | English: | PLANT FOR THE OZONATION OF A FLUID | [1985/27] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR L'OZONATION D'UN FLUIDE | [1985/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1985 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1987 | [1999/52] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191001117 (PIESTRAK CASIMIR STANISLAS [FR]); | [A]FR1088579 (CIE DES EAUX ET DE L OZONE); | [A]GB767227 (RHENO A G); | [A]DE1517541 (INST SCHIFFBAU); | [A]DE2225984 (WIEST FA RICHARD); | [X]US4141830 (LAST ANTHONY J) | Examination | GB1117 |