blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0149680

EP0149680 - APPARATUS FOR DETECTING SPEED OF ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/31]For all designated states
FANUC LTD.
3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHIDA, Hiroshi
2-2-73, Matsubara-cho Hamura-machi
Nishitama-gun Tokyo 190-11 / JP
02 / TANIGUCHI, Mitsuyuki
3-27, Tamadaira
Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP
[1985/31]
Representative(s)Allman, Peter John, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester
M2 3LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Allman, Peter John, et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Former [1985/31]Allman, Peter John, et al
MARKS & CLERK Suite 301 Sunlight House Quay Street
Manchester M3 3JY / GB
Application number, filing date84902815.411.07.1984
[1985/31]
WO1984JP00358
Priority number, dateJP1983012482211.07.1983         Original published format: JP 12482283
[1985/31]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8500430
Date:31.01.1985
Language:EN
[1985/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0149680
Date:31.07.1985
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1985/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0149680
Date:24.04.1991
Language:EN
[1991/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP31.01.1985
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.1986
ClassificationIPC:G01P3/481
[1985/31]
CPC:
G01P3/488 (EP,US); G01P3/481 (EP,US); Y10S388/912 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/31]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEISEN DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES ELEKTRISCHEN MOTORS[1985/31]
English:APPARATUS FOR DETECTING SPEED OF ELECTRIC MOTOR[1985/31]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE LA VITESSE D'UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE[1985/31]
Entry into regional phase05.03.1985Translation filed 
28.03.1985National basic fee paid 
28.03.1985Search fee paid 
28.03.1985Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.1985Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.1985Examination requested  [1985/31]
15.09.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.11.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.10.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.1990Fee for grant paid
04.12.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.01.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
17.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4024458  (TEMPLIN JACKSON R);
 [A]CH365405  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE])
International search[Y]JPS5072276U  ;
 [Y]JPS51129258  (TDK ELECTRONICS CO LTD);
 [A]JPS5551797U  ;
 [A]JPS577562  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [Y]JPS4925915B  ;
 [A]JPS501779  ;
 [Y]JPS49114474
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.