Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0163746

EP0163746 - PWM INVERTER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.1998
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO.LTD.
2-61 Imafuku Nishi 6-chome Joto-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
For all designated states
MATSUSHITA SEIKO CO.LTD.
2-61 Imafuku Nishi 6-chome Joto-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMANE, Shigeki
10-1-1011, Syonandai 1-chome
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP
02 / MORI, Keijiro
3084-9, Okada, Samukawamachi
Koza-gun Kanagawa-ken 253 / JP
03 / SAKAMOTO, Kyooya
Syosei-ryo, 2-13-1 Tujido higashi kaigan
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken 251 / JP
[1985/50]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1985/50]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7/II Aufg.
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date84904177.722.11.1984
[1985/50]
WO1984JP00558
Priority number, dateJP1983022366428.11.1983         Original published format: JP 22366483
JP1983022366528.11.1983         Original published format: JP 22366583
[1985/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8502505
Date:06.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0163746
Date:11.12.1985
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1985
[1985/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0163746
Date:23.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.1985
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1987
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/48, H02P7/63
[1985/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/50]
TitleGerman:PULSBREITENMODULATIONSWECHSELRICHTERVORRICHTUNG[1985/50]
English:PWM INVERTER APPARATUS[1985/50]
French:DISPOSITIF INVERSEUR A MODULATION PAR LARGEUR D'IMPULSIONS[1985/50]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1985Translation filed 
03.07.1985National basic fee paid 
03.07.1985Search fee paid 
03.07.1985Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1985Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.1985Examination requested  [1985/50]
02.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.08.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
11.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1994Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.08.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.10.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.1997Fee for grant paid
30.01.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination24.05.1994Appeal received No.  T0684/94
28.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
14.06.1996Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
20.09.1989Appeal received No.  J0037/89
20.09.1989Statement of grounds filed
28.02.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/09]
08.05.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/19]
24.07.1991Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
14.06.1996Date of oral proceedings
18.06.1996Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)24.01.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16]
Request for further processing for:20.09.1989Request for further processing filed
20.09.1989Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.11.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 08
16.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 12
28.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4020361
 [Y]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, vol. IA-19, no. 2, March/April 1983, pages 211-216, IEEE, New York, US; D.A. GRANT et al.: "A new high-quality PWM AC drive"
International search[X]JPS5543916
 [Y]  - KAMIYAMA TADAHIKO "New Drive Electronics" 25. July 1982 (25.07.82) Denki Syoin p. 68, 65