Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0163746 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0163746



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 381
01.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
03.03.1998 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.03.1997 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.1997 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.01.1997 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
30.01.1997 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.10.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.10.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
19.08.1996 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
16.08.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
09.08.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.07.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.07.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.07.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.07.1996 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
13.05.1996 Claims Appeal 2
13.05.1996 Claims Appeal 3
13.05.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.04.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
10.04.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.04.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 3
01.04.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
18.03.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
06.07.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.07.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
20.03.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.03.1995 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.11.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.10.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.09.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
19.09.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
24.05.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.04.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
26.03.1994 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
24.03.1994 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
24.03.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
17.01.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.09.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.08.1993 Claims Search / examination 3
11.08.1993 Description Search / examination 4
11.08.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.06.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.06.1993 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.03.1993 Minutes of telephone converstaion - Limitation Search / examination 1
24.02.1993 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
22.02.1993 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.12.1992 Claims Search / examination 3
23.12.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.11.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.10.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.06.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
17.09.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.09.1991 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.06.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
01.08.1990 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
08.05.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
28.01.1990 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal Appeal 4
26.01.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.12.1989 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
07.12.1989 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
13.11.1989 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
20.09.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
20.09.1989 Description Search / examination 3
20.09.1989 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
20.09.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.09.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
18.08.1989 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.07.1989 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 2
12.07.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.05.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.05.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.01.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.06.1987 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
21.04.1987 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.04.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.04.1987 European search report Search / examination 4
16.05.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
12.03.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.03.1986 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
15.10.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.08.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
14.08.1985 Priority document Search / examination 12
14.08.1985 Priority document Search / examination 11
14.08.1985 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
14.08.1985 Translation of priority document Search / examination 13
26.07.1985 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.07.1985 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
10.07.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Claims Search / examination 3
03.07.1985 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Description Search / examination 11
03.07.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Drawings Search / examination 5
03.07.1985 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
11.06.1985 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
11.06.1985 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 22
11.06.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.06.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.06.1985 Priority document Search / examination 13
04.06.1985 Priority document Search / examination 13
12.02.1985 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.12.1984 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.11.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3