Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0152766

EP0152766 - Reduction of an arteriosclerotic lesion by selective absorption of electromagnetic energy in a component thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.09.1987
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHILEY INCORPORATED
17600 Gillette Irvine
California / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/35]For all designated states
SHILEY INCORPORATED
17600 Gillette
Irvine California / US
Inventor(s)01 / Edelman, William
4873 Dogwood Avenue Seal Beach
Orange County California / US
02 / Rosenbluth, Robert Frank
24151 Cherry Hills Place Laguna Niguel
Orange County California / US
03 / Constantinou, Dennis
124 Sequoia Tree Lane Irvine
Orange County California / US
[1985/35]
Representative(s)Moore, James William , et al
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich
Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/35]Moore, James William, Dr. , et al
Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road
Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date85100441.617.01.1985
[1985/35]
Priority number, dateUS1984057344824.01.1984         Original published format: US 573448
[1985/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0152766
Date:28.08.1985
Language:EN
[1985/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.1985
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06, A61B17/36
[1985/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/35]
TitleGerman:Reduktion einer Arteriosklerose-Läsion durch selektive Aufnahme von elektromagnetischer Energie in einem ihrer Teile[1985/35]
English:Reduction of an arteriosclerotic lesion by selective absorption of electromagnetic energy in a component thereof[1985/35]
French:Réduction d'une lésion artériosclérotique par absorption sélective d'énergie électromagnétique dans une composante de celle-ci[1985/35]
File destroyed:21.06.1993
Examination procedure17.01.1985Examination requested  [1985/35]
12.08.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.04.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/43]
19.05.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1987/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:SearchUS4207874  [ ];
 US4418688  [ ];
 WO8301893  [ ];
 WO8303188  [ ];
 WO8302885  [ ]
    [ ] - BRUNNER, JUNGE "Wissensspeicher Lasertechnik", 1982 VEB FACHBUCHVERLAG, Leipzig pages 172-174, 311-321 * Page 172, chapter 2. 6. 3. 4; Page 173, table 2. 22, 2. 23; Page 314, chapter 3. 5. 3. 3; Page 320, " Argonlaser " *