Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0152905

EP0152905 - Method and device for localizing measuring points using ultrasonic pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/35]Method and device for localizing a measuring point using ultrasonic pulses
[1991/05]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.08.1995
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Travenol GmbH
Nymphenburger Strasse 1
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/35]For all designated states
Travenol GmbH
Nymphenburger Strasse 1
D-80335 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schumpe, G. Dr. Dr.
Tannenweg 53
D-2509 Meckenheim/Merl / DE
02 / Hansen, Markus, Dr.
Goethestrasse 46
D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE
03 / Hofmann, Peter, Prof. Dr.
Weberstrasse 105
D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE
[1991/05]
Former [1985/35]01 / Schumpe, G. Dr.
Tannenweg 53
D-2509 Meckenheim/Merl / DE
02 / Hansen, Markus, Dr.
Goethestrasse 46
D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE
03 / Hofmann, Peter, Prof. Dr.
Weberstrasse 105
D-5300 Bonn 1 / DE
Representative(s)Gudel, Diether , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
D-60313 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/35]Gudel, Diether, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
D-60313 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date85101526.313.02.1985
[1985/35]
Priority number, dateDE1984340621221.02.1984         Original published format: DE 3406212
DE1984340621021.02.1984         Original published format: DE 3406210
DE1984340617921.02.1984         Original published format: DE 3406179
DE1984340618021.02.1984         Original published format: DE 3406180
[1985/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0152905
Date:28.08.1985
Language:DE
[1985/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0152905
Date:25.03.1987
Language:DE
[1987/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0152905
Date:30.01.1991
Language:DE
[1991/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1987
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/18
[1985/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen des Ortes mehrerer Messpunkte mit Hilfe von Ultraschallimpulsen[1991/05]
English:Method and device for localizing measuring points using ultrasonic pulses[1991/05]
French:Procédé et appareil pour localiser des points de mesure par des impulsions ultrasoniques[1991/05]
Former [1985/35]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen des Ortes eines Messpunktes mit Hilfe von Ultraschallimpulsen
Former [1985/35]Method and device for localizing a measuring point using ultrasonic pulses
Former [1985/35]Procédé et appareil pour localiser un point de mesure par des impulsions ultrasoniques
Examination procedure01.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
11.08.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.03.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.07.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.1990Fee for grant paid
26.09.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991   
zebris Medizintechnik GmbH
Grabenstrasse 17
D-88316 Isny / DE
Opponent's representative
Bohnenberger, Johannes
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991   
zebris Medizintechnik GmbH
Grabenstrasse 17
D-88316 Isny / DE
Opponent's representative
Bohnenberger, Johannes
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [1991/52]
Opponent(s)01  29.10.1991   
zebris Medizintechnik GmbH
Grabenstrasse 17
D-88316 Isny / DE
Opponent's representative
Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
D-81633 München / DE
02.01.1992No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
28.07.1995Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/42]
28.07.1995Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.05.1993Appeal received No.  T0480/93
28.07.1993Statement of grounds filed
12.07.1994Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1994/29]
17.10.1994Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/43]
28.07.1995Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE30.01.1991
LU28.02.1991
AT13.02.1995
GB13.02.1995
[2015/21]
Former [1999/52]CH30.01.1991
LI30.01.1991
SE30.01.1991
LU28.02.1991
AT13.02.1995
GB13.02.1995
Former [1996/18]CH30.01.1991
LI30.01.1991
SE30.01.1991
AT13.02.1995
GB13.02.1995
Former [1996/04]SE30.01.1991
AT13.02.1995
GB13.02.1995
Former [1996/02]SE30.01.1991
AT13.02.1995
Former [1991/35]SE30.01.1991
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2372435  ;
 [Y]EP0075273  ;
 [A]US3821469  ;
 [A]DE3025234  ;
 [A]FR2305742  ;
 [A]GB2004369
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, Band IM-26, Nr. 1, März 1977, Seiten 5-10, New York, US; W.E. MORITZ et al.: "A system for locating points, lines, and planes in space"
Examination   - Aufsatz "Ganguntersuchungen und funktionelle Wirbelsäulenvermessungen mittels eines neu entwickelten Echtzeit-Stereo-Ultraschall-Topometers (ESUT)" von G. Schumpe et al., in Buch "Funktionelle Diagnostik in der Orthopädie", Ferdinand Enke Verlag, Stuttgart 1979, Seiten 69-72