Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0152905 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0152905



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1034
16.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
01.02.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.08.1995 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Search / examination 1
18.08.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.08.1995 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.07.1995 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 6
28.07.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
15.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.03.1995 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
13.03.1995 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
09.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.03.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
08.03.1995 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.03.1995 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.03.1995 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.03.1995 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
04.03.1995 Withdrawal of application Appeal 1
03.03.1995 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.03.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.02.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.02.1995 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.02.1995 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.10.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.10.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
12.07.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.07.1994 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
12.07.1994 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 1
10.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.02.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.01.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.12.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
08.12.1993 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
09.08.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.07.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.07.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 27
23.06.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.06.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.06.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
26.05.1993 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
21.05.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.05.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.05.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 216
21.05.1993 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
21.05.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.05.1993 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
05.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.04.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.03.1993 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
31.03.1993 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
31.03.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
18.02.1993 Annex to a communication Search / examination 30
18.02.1993 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
18.02.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.02.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.02.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
19.01.1993 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
11.01.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.01.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
17.12.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 3
17.12.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.12.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.11.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
30.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
25.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
24.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.11.1992 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
13.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
13.11.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
13.11.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Search / examination 1
12.11.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
11.11.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
11.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
11.11.1992 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.11.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
04.11.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.10.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
07.10.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
06.10.1992 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.10.1992 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
06.10.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.10.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.09.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
20.08.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
06.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 6
22.05.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.05.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 2
13.05.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
13.05.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
13.05.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 2
13.05.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 7
20.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
20.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
18.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
21.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 3
10.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 4
10.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 3
10.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
10.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 2
02.01.1992 Brief communication with time limit Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Search / examination 2
13.11.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Search / examination 1
29.10.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 1
29.10.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 215
29.10.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 7
29.10.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 5
29.10.1991 Notice of opposition Search / examination 10
29.10.1991 Notice of opposition Search / examination 4
20.12.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.10.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.10.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.10.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.07.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
23.07.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.06.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
13.06.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
29.05.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
20.03.1990 Claims Search / examination 4
20.03.1990 Description Search / examination 24
20.03.1990 Drawings Search / examination 4
20.03.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.1990 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 5
15.02.1990 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
12.02.1990 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
12.02.1990 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.01.1990 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.01.1990 Claims Search / examination 1
04.01.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.12.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.12.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.11.1987 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.11.1987 Claims Search / examination 4
31.03.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.02.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.02.1987 European search report Search / examination 3
27.09.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.07.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.03.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.03.1985 Priority document Search / examination 16
27.03.1985 Priority document Search / examination 15
27.03.1985 Priority document Search / examination 23
27.03.1985 Priority document Search / examination 21
13.02.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.02.1985 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.02.1985 Claims Search / examination 4
13.02.1985 Description Search / examination 28
13.02.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.02.1985 Drawings Search / examination 5
13.02.1985 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.02.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10