blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0157202

EP0157202 - Digital PWMed pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha
1-17, Ohsaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/41]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Meidensha
1-17, Ohsaki 2-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ashikaga, Tadashi
2-5-10, Ohsaki Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Kamanaka, Yoshihide
3-18-5, Kita-senzoku Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Fushimi, Keiko
2833-70, Totsuka-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1985/41]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [1985/41]Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys)
Postfach 22 16 11
D-80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date85102483.605.03.1985
[1985/41]
Priority number, dateJP1984004438008.03.1984         Original published format: JP 4438084
JP1984004438208.03.1984         Original published format: JP 4438284
[1985/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0157202
Date:09.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0157202
Date:04.10.1989
Language:EN
[1989/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1985
ClassificationIPC:H02M7/539, H02P5/40
[1985/41]
CPC:
H02M7/53873 (EP,US); H02P27/04 (KR); H02M7/53876 (EP,US);
Y10S388/907 (EP,US); Y10S388/912 (EP,US); Y10S388/915 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1985/41]
TitleGerman:Pulsgenerator mit digitaler Pulsweitenmodulation[1985/41]
English:Digital PWMed pulse generator[1985/41]
French:Générateur d'impulsions à modulation numérique d'impulsions en durée[1985/41]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure25.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/23]
25.05.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
05.02.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.1989Fee for grant paid
12.06.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.198905   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1989
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3220204  (HITACHI LTD [JP])
 [A]  - IEE PROCEEDINGS-PART B, vol. 128, no. 6, November 1981, Old Woking, Surrey, GB; S.R. BOWES et al. "Microprocessor control of PWM inverters", pages 293-305
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, Vol: IE-29, no. 1, February 1982, New York, USA; K.S. RAJASHEKARA et al. "Microprocessor based sinusoidal PWM inverter by DMA transfer", pges 46-51
 [A]  - SIEMENS-ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 45, no. 10, 1971; W. FLÖTER et al. "Die Transvektor-Regelung für den feldorientierten Betrieb einer Asynchrommaschine", pages 761-764
 [A]  - REGELGUNGSTECHNIK, vol. 27, no. 12, December 1979; R. GABRIEL et al. "Regelung der stromrichtergespeisten Drehstrom-Asynchronmaschine mit einem Mikrorechner", pages 379-386
 [A]  - SIEMENS-FORSCH.- U. ENTWICKL.- BERICHT, vol. 1, no. 1, 1972; F. BLASCHKE "Das Verfahren der Feldorientierung zur Regelung der Asynchronmaschine", pages 184-193
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.