blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0168555

EP0168555 - Throwaway insert [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.1989
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.1989 [1989/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/04]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LIMITED
No. 15, Kitahama 5-chome, Higashi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Jun c/o Itami Works
Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi Hyogo / JP
02 / Mori, Yoshikatsu c/o Itami Works
Sumitomo Electric Ind. Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome
Itami-shi Hyogo / JP
[1986/04]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/04]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date85103238.320.03.1985
[1986/04]
Priority number, dateJP1984009859328.06.1984         Original published format: JP 9859384
[1986/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0168555
Date:22.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0168555
Date:31.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1985
ClassificationIPC:B23B27/14
[1986/04]
CPC:
B23B27/143 (EP,US); Y10T407/235 (EP,US); Y10T428/12389 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24182 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1986/04]
TitleGerman:Schneideinsatz[1986/04]
English:Throwaway insert[1986/04]
French:Plaquette de coupe[1986/04]
Examination procedure21.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/22]
27.03.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.02.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.1988Fee for grant paid
04.05.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP59001105  ;
 [X]DE2845211  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO);
 [A]EP0066091  (STELLRAM SA [CH])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 83 (M-290)[1520], 17th April 1984; & JP-A-59 001 105 (MITSUBISHI KINZOKU K.K.) 06-01-1984, & JP59001105 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.