Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0162238

EP0162238 - Axial piston machine, especially a pump of the inclined plate type [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1985/48]Axial piston machine, especially a pump of the inclined plate or inclined axis type
[1988/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.1989
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.10.1989 [1989/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydromatik GmbH
Glockeraustrasse 2
89275 Elchingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/48]For all designated states
Hydromatik GmbH
Glockeraustrasse 2
D-89275 Elchingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wagenseil, Ludwig
Reiherstrasse 20
D-7917 Vöhringen / DE
02 / Lotter, Manfred
Schlesierstrasse 16
D-7910 Neu-Ulm / DE
[1985/48]
Representative(s)Körber, Wolfhart , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/48]Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09
D-80066 München / DE
Application number, filing date85103801.829.03.1985
[1985/48]
Priority number, dateDE1984341305906.04.1984         Original published format: DE 3413059
[1985/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0162238
Date:27.11.1985
Language:DE
[1985/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0162238
Date:02.11.1988
Language:DE
[1988/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.1985
ClassificationInternational:F04B1/20
[1985/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1985/48]
TitleGerman:Axialkolbenmaschine, insbesondere -pumpe der Schrägscheiben- bauart[1988/44]
English:Axial piston machine, especially a pump of the inclined plate type[1988/44]
French:Machine à pistons axiaux, en particulier pompe du type à plateau incliné[1988/44]
Former [1985/48]Axialkolbenmaschine, insbesondere -pumpe der Schrägscheiben- oder Schrägachsenbauart
Former [1985/48]Axial piston machine, especially a pump of the inclined plate or inclined axis type
Former [1985/48]Machine à pistons axiaux, en particulier pompe du type à plateaux ou axes inclinés
Examination procedure21.10.1985Examination requested  [1986/02]
22.09.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
09.12.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.1988Fee for grant paid
13.06.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB311938  ;
 [Y]DE910239  ;
 [Y]US3545338  ;
 [Y]DE1200135  ;
 [Y]DE2238582  ;
 [A]DE886835