Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0159635

EP0159635 - Process for improving the dyeability of nylon carpet fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  27.05.1993
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/44]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kobsa, Henry
111 Green Spring Road
Greenville Delaware 19807 / US
02 / Windley, William Thomas
418 N. Willey Street
Seaford Delaware 19973 / US
[1985/44]
Representative(s)Abitz, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
81628 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/44]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09
D-81628 München / DE
Application number, filing date85104463.612.04.1985
[1985/44]
Priority number, dateUS1984059940912.04.1984         Original published format: US 599409
[1985/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0159635
Date:30.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0159635
Date:22.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0159635
Date:05.09.1990
Language:EN
[1990/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.1987
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/80, D02J13/00
[1985/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL [1985/44]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Färbbarkeit von Nylon-Teppichfasern[1985/44]
English:Process for improving the dyeability of nylon carpet fiber[1985/44]
French:Procédé pour l'affinité tinctoriale de fibres de nylon pour tapis[1985/44]
Examination procedure10.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/05]
26.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.11.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.1990Fee for grant paid
29.01.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.05.1991  11.06.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres S.A.
Tour du Credit Lyonnais 129, rue Servient
FR-69003 Lyon / FR
Opponent's representative
Esson, Jean-Pierre
Rhodia Services
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
25 Quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2009/30]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.1991  11.06.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres S.A.
Tour du Credit Lyonnais 129, rue Servient
FR-69003 Lyon / FR
Opponent's representative
Esson, Jean-Pierre
Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25 Quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
Former [1993/18]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.1991  11.06.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres S.A.
Tour du Credit Lyonnais 129, rue Servient
FR-69003 Lyon / FR
Opponent's representative
Esson, Jean-Pierre
RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, BP 62
F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
Former [1993/15]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.1991  11.06.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres S.A.
Tour du Credit Lyonnais 129, rue Servient
FR-69003 Lyon / FR
Opponent's representative
Esson, Jean-Pierre
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres Service Brevets Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62
F-69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR
Former [1991/30]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.1991   
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres S.A.
Tour du Credit Lyonnais 129, rue Servient
FR-69003 Lyon / FR
Opponent's representative
Braconnier, Daniel
Rhône-Poulenc Fibres, Brevets Fibres & Polymères, BP 62, Centre de Recherche des Carrières
F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR
11.07.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.01.1992Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
21.02.1992Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.12.1992Date of oral proceedings
05.01.1993Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.01.1993Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
15.01.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/28]
Appeal following opposition05.03.1993Appeal received No.  T0257/93
05.04.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US3707522  ;
 [X]FR1358008  ;
 [A]FR1534277  ;
 [A]FR2060568