blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0161624

EP0161624 - Method of producing a camshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.1989
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morita, Akiyoshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Nonoyama, Hideo
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Fukuizumi, Toshiharu
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP
[1985/47]
Representative(s)Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date85105586.307.05.1985
[1985/47]
Priority number, dateJP1984009165507.05.1984         Original published format: JP 9165584
[1985/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0161624
Date:21.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0161624
Date:23.07.1986
Language:EN
[1986/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.1986
ClassificationIPC:C21D9/30, C21D1/09
[1985/47]
CPC:
C21D9/30 (EP,US); C21D5/00 (EP,US); F16H53/02 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2101 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Nockenwelle[1985/47]
English:Method of producing a camshaft[1985/47]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un arbre à cames[1985/47]
File destroyed:18.07.1995
Examination procedure07.05.1985Examination requested  [1985/47]
20.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/13]
28.09.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1989/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]JP5923156  ;
 [X]JP57200523  ;
 [X]DE2939572  (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3212214  (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]DE2344270  (AUDI AG)
 [XD]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 116 (M-299) [1553], 30th May 1984, page 80 M 299; & JP - A - 59 23 156 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 06-02-1984, & JP5923156 A 00000000
 [X]  - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 53 (C-154) [1198], 3rd March 1983; & JP - A - 57 200 523 (MITSUBISHI JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 08-12-1982, & JP57200523 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.