blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0205632

EP0205632 - Setting mechanism for a watch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.1987
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Timex Corporation
P.O. Box 2126
Waterbury, Connecticut 06720 / US
[1986/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Namyslo, Wilhelm
Strietweg 11
D-7530 Pforzheim / DE
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date85107648.920.06.1985
[1986/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0205632
Date:30.12.1986
Language:DE
[1986/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.1986
ClassificationIPC:G04B37/10
[1986/52]
CPC:
G04B37/106 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Stellmechanismus für eine Uhr[1986/52]
English:Setting mechanism for a watch[1986/52]
French:Dispositif de mise à l'heure pour montre[1986/52]
File destroyed:21.06.1993
Examination procedure13.03.1987Application withdrawn by applicant  [1987/19]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]CH348928  ;
 [Y]EP0030696  ;
 [A]DE1914325  ;
 [A]CH291565  ;
 [A]US4152889
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.