Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0167136

EP0167136 - Selective anisotropic reactive ion etching process for polysilicide composite structures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.1991
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.1991 [1991/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/02]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Merkling, Robert Mitchell, Jr.
14370 Clearview Avenue
Gainesville, VA 22065 / US
02 / Stanasolovich, David
8464 McKenzie Circle
Manassas, VA 22110 / US
[1986/02]
Representative(s)Mönig, Anton , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/28]Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1986/02]Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat.
Schönaicher Strasse 220
D-7030 Böblingen / DE
Application number, filing date85108082.001.07.1985
[1986/02]
Priority number, dateUS1984062855806.07.1984         Original published format: US 628558
[1986/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0167136
Date:08.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0167136
Date:27.04.1988
Language:EN
[1988/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0167136
Date:05.12.1990
Language:EN
[1990/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.1988
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/31, H01L21/28
[1988/12]
Former International [1986/02]H01L21/28, H01L21/31
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1986/02]
TitleGerman:Selektives anisotropisches reaktives Ionenätzverfahren für zusammengesetzte Strukturen aus Polysiliziden[1986/02]
English:Selective anisotropic reactive ion etching process for polysilicide composite structures[1986/02]
French:Attaque sélective et anisotropique par ions réactifs pour structures composites en polysiliciures[1986/02]
Examination procedure23.05.1986Examination requested  [1986/30]
16.02.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.1990Fee for grant paid
19.06.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]JP58132933  ;
 [A]GB2098931  ;
 [A]US4436584
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 243 (E-207)[1388], 28th October 1983; & JP-A-58 132 933 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 08-08-1983, & JP58132933 A 00000000
 [AP]  - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY : PART B, vol. 3, no. 1, second series, January-February 1985, pages 16-19, American Vacuum Society, New York, US; M. KIMIZUKA et al.: "Pattern profile control of polysilicon plasma etching"