Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0168808

EP0168808 - Particle fuel diversion apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.02.1988
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ESHLAND ENTERPRISES, INC.
120 East Grant Street Greencastle
Pennsylvania 17225 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/04]For all designated states
ESHLAND ENTERPRISES, INC.
120 East Grant Street
Greencastle Pennsylvania 17225 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eshleman, Roger D.
120 East Grant Street
Greencastle Pennsylvania 17225 / US
[1986/04]
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/04]Howden, Christopher Andrew , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date85108851.815.07.1985
[1986/04]
Priority number, dateUS1984063299820.07.1984         Original published format: US 632998
[1986/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0168808
Date:22.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0168808
Date:17.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:F23B5/04, F23K3/22, F23K3/16
[1986/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/04]
TitleGerman:Ablenkungsvorrichtung für teilchenförmigen Brennstoff[1986/04]
English:Particle fuel diversion apparatus[1986/04]
French:Appareil de déviation pour combustible sous forme de particules[1986/04]
File destroyed:11.08.1994
Examination procedure18.06.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/12]
22.10.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/12]
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2002501  ;
 [Y]FR895629  ;
 [A]US4380228  ;
 [A]DE1141767  ;
 [A]FR1200301  ;
 [A]US4194487