Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0173057

EP0173057 - Composition polymerisable by irradiation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1986/10]Composition polymerisable by irradiation, copolymers thereof and their preparation process
[1989/07]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.1990
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.02.1990 [1990/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For all designated states
Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/10]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
For all designated states
Röhm GmbH
Kirschenallee
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Geissler, Ulrich, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Altenauer Strasse 34
D-6203 Hochheim/Main / DE
02 / Albrecht, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Vogelsbergstrasse 20
D-6500 Mainz 42 / DE
[1986/10]
Representative(s)Euler, Kurt Emil , et al
KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540
D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/10]Euler, Kurt Emil, Dr. , et al
KALLE Niederlassung der Hoechst AG Rheingaustrasse 190 Postfach 3540
D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE
Application number, filing date85108927.617.07.1985
[1986/10]
Priority number, dateDE1984342751926.07.1984         Original published format: DE 3427519
[1986/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0173057
Date:05.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0173057
Date:20.11.1986
Language:DE
[1986/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0173057
Date:15.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/68
[1986/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/10]
TitleGerman:Durch Strahlung polymerisierbares Gemisch[1989/07]
English:Composition polymerisable by irradiation[1989/07]
French:Composition polymérisable par irradiation[1989/07]
Former [1986/10]Durch Strahlung polymerisierbares Gemisch, darin enthaltenes Mischpolymerisat und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Mischpolymerisats
Former [1986/10]Composition polymerisable by irradiation, copolymers thereof and their preparation process
Former [1986/10]Composition polymérisable par irradiation, les polymères compris dans cette composition et la méthode pour les obtenir
MiscellaneousEPB 1989/07: Teilanmeldung 87118228 eingereicht am 09.12.87
Examination procedure19.12.1986Examination requested  [1987/09]
05.06.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.02.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.08.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1988Fee for grant paid
22.11.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP87118228.3  / EP0271077
Opposition(s)16.11.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XD]DE2363806  (HOECHST AG);
 [A]DE3028136  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD);
 [A]US3554913  (GISSER HENRY, et al);
 [A]DE2509473  (ROEHM GMBH)