Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0171665

EP0171665 - Method and device for the continuous production of inorganically bonded processing materials, in particular of processing boards [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.12.1992
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/08]For all designated states
FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sattler, Heinz, Dr.-Ing.
Warnowstrasse 6
D-3300 Braunschweig / DE
[1989/10]
Former [1986/08]01 / Sattler, Heinz, Dr.-Ing.
Warnowstrasse 6
D-300 Braunschweig / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1989/52]
Former [1988/40]Weber, Otto Ernst, Dipl.-Phys.
Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3
D-81479 München / DE
Former [1988/38](deleted)
...
Former [1987/48]Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55
D-81541 München / DE
Former [1987/44]Strasse, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Strasse, Vonnemann & Partner Balanstrasse 55
D-81541 München / DE
Former [1986/49](deleted)
...
Former [1986/08]Kraus, Walter, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
D-80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date85109226.223.07.1985
[1986/08]
Priority number, dateDE1984342979013.08.1984         Original published format: DE 3429790
DE1984344183915.11.1984         Original published format: DE 3441839
[1986/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0171665
Date:19.02.1986
Language:DE
[1986/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0171665
Date:08.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/10]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0171665
Date:20.01.1993
Language:DE
[1993/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.1985
ClassificationInternational:B28B5/02, C04B11/00
[1986/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   SE [1986/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung von anorganisch gebundenen Werkstoffen, insbesondere von Werkstoffplatten[1986/08]
English:Method and device for the continuous production of inorganically bonded processing materials, in particular of processing boards[1986/08]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication continue de matériaux de prise anorganiques, en particulier de panneaux de ces matériaux[1986/08]
Examination procedure19.06.1986Examination requested  [1986/35]
05.05.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
11.05.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.09.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.1988Fee for grant paid
11.10.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.12.1989  22.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
G. Siempelkamp GmbH & Co.
Siempelkampstrasse 75
D-47803 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Andrejewski, Walter
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54
45002 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/06]
Opponent(s)01  06.12.1989  22.02.1990  ADMISSIBLE
G. Siempelkamp GmbH & Co.
Siempelkampstrasse 75
D-47803 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Andrejewski, Walter, Dr.
Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Partner Postfach 10 02 54
D-45002 Essen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.02.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.07.1990Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.07.1990Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
22.08.1990Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
25.01.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
16.06.1992Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.1992Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.09.1992Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.10.1992Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.03.1991Appeal received No.  T0205/91
25.05.1991Statement of grounds filed
16.06.1992Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.06.1992Date of oral proceedings
01.07.1992Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:15.03.1988Date of receipt
26.04.1988Request accepted
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.198703   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1988
Former [1990/26]BE31.07.1989
Documents cited:SearchAT123984B  [ ]
    [ ] - LUEGER, "Lexikon der Technik", Band 3, 1961 DEUTSCHE VERLAGS-ANSTALT, Stuttgart Seite 569 * Stichwort R}ckdehnung *