Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0174527

EP0174527 - Manufacturing method of an inflatable hollow object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.1991
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METZELER Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Gneisenaustrasse 15
D-80992 München / DE
[1988/20]
Former [1986/12]For all designated states
METZELER KAUTSCHUK GMBH
Gneisenaustrasse 15
D-8000 München 50 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Härtel, Volker, Dr.
Fichtenstrasse 50
D-8034 Germering / DE
02 / Höglinger, Gerhard
Zinnkopfstrasse 7
D-8200 Rosenheim / DE
03 / Schreiber, Hans
Dr.-Werner-Strasse 42
D-8038 Gröbenzell / DE
[1986/12]
Representative(s)Michelis, Theodor
Tattenbachstrasse 9
D-80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/12]Michelis, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing.
Tattenbachstrasse 9
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date85110506.421.08.1985
[1986/12]
Priority number, dateDE1984343311308.09.1984         Original published format: DE 3433113
DE1984343515725.09.1984         Original published format: DE 3435157
[1986/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0174527
Date:19.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0174527
Date:07.10.1987
Language:DE
[1987/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0174527
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.1987
ClassificationInternational:B29D22/00, B29C65/02, B29C35/02
[1987/37]
Former International [1986/12]B29D22/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1986/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines aufblasbaren Hohlkörpers[1986/12]
English:Manufacturing method of an inflatable hollow object[1986/12]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un objet creux gonflable[1986/12]
Examination procedure21.08.1985Examination requested  [1986/12]
29.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.12.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.1990Fee for grant paid
13.03.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1520470  ;
 [X]US2429123  ;
 [Y]GB937194  ;
 [A]FR770232  ;
 [A]GB628037  ;
 [A]US3383265  ;
 [A]US3205114  ;
 [A]EP0012848