Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0192816

EP0192816 - Workshop arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.1996
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 31.10.2007  [2007/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Priesemuth, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Postkamp 13
25524 Itzehoe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]For all designated states
Priesemuth, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Postkamp 13
D-25524 Itzehoe / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1986/36]
Representative(s)Barske, Heiko
Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/52]Barske, Heiko, Dr. rer. nat.
Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1995/34]Barske, Heiko, Dr.
Radeckestrasse 43
D-81245 München / DE
Former [1989/05]Schöning, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Niedmers & Schöning Stahltwiete 23
D-22761 Hamburg / DE
Former [1988/47]Schöning, Hans Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Niedmers & Schöning Jessenstrasse 4
D-2000 Hamburg 50 / DE
Former [1986/36]Siewers, Gescha, Dr.
Rechtsanwälte Dr. Harmsen, Dr. Utescher Dipl.-Chem. Harmsen, Bartholatus Dr. Schaeffer, Dr. Fricke, Wolter Patentanwalt Dr. Siewers Adenauerallee 28
D-20097 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date85111528.712.09.1985
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateDE1985350576320.02.1985         Original published format: DE 3505763
[1986/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0192816
Date:03.09.1986
Language:DE
[1986/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0192816
Date:20.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0192816
Date:22.03.1995
Language:DE
[1995/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.1987
ClassificationInternational:B25H1/00, B25H1/20
[1986/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Arbeitsplatzanordnung[1986/36]
English:Workshop arrangement[1986/36]
French:Arrangement d'atelier[1986/36]
Examination procedure20.11.1986Examination requested  [1987/04]
13.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1991Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.11.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.12.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.1994Fee for grant paid
07.03.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination29.05.1991Appeal received No.  T0908/91
03.08.1991Statement of grounds filed
29.09.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/40]
21.10.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/43]
16.11.1993Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)23.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 09
14.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
16.12.199208   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1993
30.09.199309   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1993
30.09.199410   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE22.03.1995
FR22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
IT22.03.1995
NL22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
AT12.09.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
[2006/14]
Former [2000/27]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
IT22.03.1995
NL22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
AT12.09.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
Former [2000/05]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
IT22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
AT12.09.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
LU30.09.1995
Former [1999/42]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
IT22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
AT12.09.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
Former [1997/16]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
AT12.09.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
Former [1997/13]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
CH30.09.1995
LI30.09.1995
Former [1996/04]BE22.03.1995
GB22.03.1995
SE22.06.1995
FR18.08.1995
Former [1995/52]FR18.08.1995
Documents cited:Search[X]US3537381  ;
 [Y]FR1465694  ;
 [Y]US2694614  ;
 [A]DE3116352  ;
 [E]FR2577159