blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0192819

EP0192819 - Collective wiring system and method of control thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  04.11.1993
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oho, Shigeru
Mikanohararyo, 20-1 Mizukicho-2-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
02 / Hirayama, Takeshi
359-1, Motoyoshidacho
Mito-shi / JP
03 / Matsumoto, Masahiro
2142, Kamikuratacho
Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP
04 / Hasegawa, Akira
11-12, Matsudocho-2-chome
Katsuta-shi / JP
05 / Hamano, Fumio
Kozanryo, 1034
Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi / JP
06 / Shibata, Takanori
15-12, Onumacho-4-chome
Hitachi-shi / JP
[1986/36]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstraße 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [1986/36]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date85111861.219.09.1985
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateJP1985003365823.02.1985         Original published format: JP 3365885
JP1985005843825.03.1985         Original published format: JP 5843885
[1986/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0192819
Date:03.09.1986
Language:EN
[1986/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0192819
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.1988
ClassificationIPC:H04Q9/00, B60R16/02
[1986/36]
CPC:
H04Q9/00 (EP,US); G08C23/00 (KR); B60R16/0315 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Kollektives Verkabelungssystem und Steuerungsverfahren des Systems[1986/36]
English:Collective wiring system and method of control thereof[1986/36]
French:Système de câblage collectif et méthode de commande du système[1986/36]
MiscellaneousEPB 1993/48: Teilanmeldung 92101627.5 eingereicht am 19/09/85
EPB 1993/48: Divisional application 92101627.5 filed on 19/09/85
EPB 1993/48: Demande divisionnaire 92101627.5 déposée le 19/09/85
Examination procedure02.08.1988Examination requested  [1988/39]
06.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/51]
21.09.1993Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/51]
Appeal following examination13.08.1992Appeal received No.  T1059/92
11.11.1992Statement of grounds filed
21.09.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
21.09.1993Date of oral proceedings
23.09.1993Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP92101627.5  / EP0487503
EP93115108.8  / EP0580189
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199309   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2433025  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT);
 [Y]US4019172  (SRODES PAUL G);
 [X]US4185272  (FEIKER GEORGE E [US]);
 [X]FR2445769  (RENAULT);
 [Y]EP0117832  (ESSEX GROUP [US]);
 [X]DE3317652  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE])
 [X]  - IEE PROCEEDINGS, SECTION A-I, vol. 129, no. 6, part E, November 1982, pages 223-228, Old Woking, Surrey, GB; N.C.G.N. PRESTON et al.: "Multiprocessor implementation of the logic function of a multiplexed wiring system for automotives"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.