Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0184086 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0184086



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1692
04.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
14.03.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
22.11.2001 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
15.10.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.10.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.10.2001 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.05.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.05.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.05.2001 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.05.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2001 Claims Appeal 2
16.05.2001 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
16.05.2001 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
08.05.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
25.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
23.04.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
17.04.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
17.04.2001 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
17.04.2001 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
17.04.2001 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 2
17.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 31
17.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
14.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.04.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
23.03.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.03.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
22.03.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
16.03.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.03.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.03.2001 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.03.2001 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.03.2001 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
01.03.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
16.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
15.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
15.02.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
14.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.02.2001 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
12.02.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
05.02.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.02.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.02.2001 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
05.02.2001 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
30.01.2001 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
30.01.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.01.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.01.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
27.01.2001 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
25.01.2001 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
22.05.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
22.05.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
08.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
17.04.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
13.04.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
13.04.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
13.04.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
10.04.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
10.04.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
07.04.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
02.02.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.02.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.02.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
02.02.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
31.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
28.01.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
09.11.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal Appeal 1
09.11.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
26.10.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.09.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
02.08.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
02.08.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
02.08.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
27.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.07.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.07.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.07.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.07.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.07.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.05.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
10.05.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
10.05.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
10.05.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
10.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.02.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
06.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.01.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
29.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
29.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.01.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
25.01.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
25.01.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
25.01.1999 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
25.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
25.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
20.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
14.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
12.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
08.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
05.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
04.01.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
23.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
21.12.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
21.12.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
21.12.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
21.12.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 13
21.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 41
21.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.12.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 17
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 41
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 22
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
16.12.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1998 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.12.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
16.12.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
16.12.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
16.12.1998 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.12.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
18.10.1998 N/A Opposition 1
15.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.06.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.06.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.06.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.06.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
02.06.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
02.06.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
02.06.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.05.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.04.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.04.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.04.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.04.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.03.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.03.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.03.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
29.07.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.07.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
25.07.1997 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 27
02.06.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.05.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.05.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.03.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.03.1997 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.01.1997 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
22.01.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
15.01.1997 General authorisation Opposition 1
15.01.1997 Submission concerning representation Opposition 2
15.12.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
15.11.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
15.11.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.11.1996 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
05.11.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.10.1996 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
30.10.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.10.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
21.10.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
21.10.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.10.1996 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.10.1996 N/A Opposition 1
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.10.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
14.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
14.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
14.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
10.10.1996 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
10.10.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
10.10.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
10.10.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
10.10.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.10.1996 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
10.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.10.1996 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.11.1995 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.09.1995 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.06.1995 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
31.05.1995 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.02.1995 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.02.1995 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
20.01.1995 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.12.1994 Description Search / examination 12
09.12.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.08.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.04.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.03.1994 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.02.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.02.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.02.1994 Claims Appeal 3
22.02.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 22
22.02.1994 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
22.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
22.02.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
21.02.1994 Claims Appeal 3
21.02.1994 Claims Appeal 3
21.02.1994 Claims Appeal 3
21.02.1994 Claims Appeal 2
21.02.1994 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
13.12.1993 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.12.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.12.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
24.11.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 1
06.08.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
06.08.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
10.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
10.06.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
03.06.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
03.04.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
05.02.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.02.1992 Description Search / examination 21
05.02.1992 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.02.1992 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 10
07.01.1992 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
25.11.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
25.11.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
25.11.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
25.11.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
25.11.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
25.11.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
04.10.1991 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.07.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.01.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.07.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.01.1989 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
22.12.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.10.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.10.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
02.05.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.01.1986 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
15.01.1986 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 2
15.01.1986 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
07.01.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 1
07.01.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.01.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
07.01.1986 Priority document Search / examination 41
22.11.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Claims Search / examination 3
22.11.1985 Description Search / examination 36
22.11.1985 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.11.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
22.11.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
22.11.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10