blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0198954

EP0198954 - Liquid crystal display [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.03.1991 [1991/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Larsen, Thor Arne
17 Niles Drive
Woodstock New York 12498 / US
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Grant, Iain Murray
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]Grant, Iain Murray
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date85115323.903.12.1985
[1986/44]
Priority number, dateUS1985072412817.04.1985         Original published format: US 724128
[1986/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0198954
Date:29.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0198954
Date:21.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1986
ClassificationIPC:G02F1/133, G09G3/36
[1986/44]
CPC:
G02F1/136277 (EP,US); G09G3/3648 (EP,US); G09G2300/0814 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1986/44]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeige[1986/44]
English:Liquid crystal display[1986/44]
French:Affichage à cristal liquide[1986/44]
Examination procedure24.02.1987Examination requested  [1987/18]
28.07.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.1989Fee for grant paid
08.09.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchEP0034796  [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]);
 US4443064  [ ] (GRINBERG JAN [US], et al)
 [Y]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 7B, December 1981 S.W. DEPP A. JULIANA "Method of fabricating FET in polycrystalline silicon" pages 3640-3641
 [AD]  - IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, vol. EDL-1, no. 9, September 1980 D.J. DIMARIA et al. "Electrically-Alterable Memory Using a Dual Electron Injector Structure" pages 179-181
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 8, January 1981 S.W.DEEP, A. JULIANA "Liquid Crystal Display Driver Circuit and Polysilicon Components Therefor" pages 3863-3864
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 6, November 1980 S.W. DEEP et al. "Liquid Crystal Drive Circuit" pages 2557-2558
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.