EP0156407 - Device for electrolytic applying a metal coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meco Equipment Engineers B.V. De Beverspijken 3 P.O. Box 2214 NL-5202 CE 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piepers, Harry Christiaan Jan Luikenstraat 44 NL-5615 JM Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
van Poele, Gerard J. Hobbemaplein 13 NL-5151 SL Drunen / NL | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al P. Petersstraat 160, P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al P. Petersstraat 160, P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200191.6 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | US19840582993 | 24.02.1984 Original published format: US 582993 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156407 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156407 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02, C25D5/08 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
C25D5/022 (EP,US);
C25D5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elektrolytischen Metallbeschichtung | [1985/40] | English: | Device for electrolytic applying a metal coating | [1985/40] | French: | Installation pour le dépôt électrolytique des métaux | [1985/40] | File destroyed: | 12.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/32] | 31.08.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/09] | 07.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4032422 (ROSS JOHN P, et al); | [X]US4113577 (ROSS JOHN P, et al) |