blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0159745

EP0159745 - Drumstick cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STORK PMT B.V.
43a Wim de Körverstraat
5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
[N/P]
Former [1985/44]For all designated states
STORK PMT B.V.
43a Wim de Körverstraat
NL-5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Van der Eerden, Henricus F.J.M.
De Blauwverver 74
NL-5283 XW Boxtel / NL
[1985/44]
Representative(s)Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [1985/44]Timmers, Cornelis Herman Johannes, et al
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date85200468.825.03.1985
[1985/44]
Priority number, dateNL1984000112309.04.1984         Original published format: NL 8401123
[1985/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0159745
Date:30.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0159745
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.1985
ClassificationIPC:A22C21/00
[1985/44]
CPC:
A22C21/0023 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/44]
TitleGerman:Schneidevorrichtung für Geflügelkeulen[1985/44]
English:Drumstick cutter[1985/44]
French:Dispositif de coupe du pilon d'une volaille[1989/28]
Former [1985/44]Dispositif de coupe de drumstick
Examination procedure11.09.1985Examination requested  [1985/49]
18.11.1986Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
05.01.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.01.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.1989Fee for grant paid
04.04.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.04.198905   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.1989
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.1989
BE12.07.1989
CH12.07.1989
LI12.07.1989
SE01.01.1990
LU31.03.1990
[1999/52]
Former [1995/46]AT12.07.1989
BE12.07.1989
CH12.07.1989
LI12.07.1989
SE01.01.1990
Former [1991/12]AT12.07.1989
BE12.07.1989
CH12.07.1989
LI12.07.1989
Former [1990/19]AT12.07.1989
CH12.07.1989
LI12.07.1989
Former [1990/17]CH12.07.1989
LI12.07.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]GB454006  (WALDEMAR OTTO LASSEN);
 [A]US2855624  (JEROME WALLACE H, et al);
 [A]US3038197  (TURNER HERMAN B);
 [A]US3271815  (RAY HOOLEY ELDON);
 [A]US3643293  (REJSA JACK J, et al);
 [A]US4091503  (FOX GASTON M, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.