Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0155149

EP0155149 - Water impervious materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.1990
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.1997 [1997/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHICOPEE
317 George Street New Brunswick
New Jersey 08903 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/38]For all designated states
CHICOPEE
317 George Street
New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mays, Alfred Thomas
6 Lynnfield Drive
East Windsor New Jersey 08520 / US
[1985/38]
Representative(s)Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/38]Jones, Alan John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date85301606.108.03.1985
[1985/38]
Priority number, dateUS1984058803709.03.1984         Original published format: US 588037
[1985/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0155149
Date:18.09.1985
Language:EN
[1985/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0155149
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0155149
Date:06.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.1987
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/12, A61B19/08
[1989/36]
Former International [1985/38]B32B27/12
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1985/38]
TitleGerman:Wasserdichte Materialien[1985/38]
English:Water impervious materials[1985/38]
French:Matériaux imperméables[1985/38]
Examination procedure13.08.1987Examination requested  [1987/41]
09.01.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.1989Fee for grant paid
20.03.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4186235  ;
 [AD]GB1367476  ;
 [A]GB1073181