Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0157600 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0157600



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 814
06.11.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.10.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
09.09.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
09.09.1997 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
28.08.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.08.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.08.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 12
02.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.08.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.08.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 4
28.07.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 28
19.07.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.07.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
10.07.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.07.1997 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
03.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.06.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
14.05.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.05.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.05.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.05.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.05.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.05.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.03.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.07.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
19.06.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.06.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
12.06.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.03.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.03.1995 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.03.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
16.02.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.02.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
15.02.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.01.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.11.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.11.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.11.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.11.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
17.11.1994 Claims Opposition 2
17.11.1994 Claims Opposition 2
17.11.1994 Claims Opposition 2
17.11.1994 Claims Opposition 2
17.11.1994 Claims Opposition 1
17.11.1994 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
17.11.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
17.11.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
17.11.1994 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
08.11.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.10.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
11.10.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.10.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.10.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
11.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.10.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.10.1994 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.09.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.09.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.09.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
16.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.09.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
18.08.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.08.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.07.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
05.07.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
17.05.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.04.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.04.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.04.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.04.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.04.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.04.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
06.04.1994 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.04.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
26.03.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.03.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.03.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.03.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.03.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.03.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
22.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
22.11.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
22.11.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
22.11.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
10.09.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.09.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.07.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.07.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.05.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.05.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.04.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.04.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 86
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 60
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
01.04.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.04.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
30.03.1993 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
22.05.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.02.1992 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.02.1992 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.02.1992 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.01.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 1
21.11.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
14.11.1991 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.11.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.07.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
08.05.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.04.1991 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
14.03.1991 Claims Search / examination 2
14.03.1991 Description Search / examination 4
14.03.1991 Drawings Search / examination 4
14.03.1991 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.03.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.01.1991 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.10.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.09.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.05.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.05.1990 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
02.04.1990 Claims Search / examination 2
02.04.1990 Description Search / examination 10
02.04.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.04.1990 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
25.01.1990 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.12.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
11.12.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.10.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.10.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.09.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.07.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
10.03.1987 General enquiry Search / examination 1
05.10.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
22.05.1985 Description Search / examination 16
22.05.1985 Description Search / examination 16
22.05.1985 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.03.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.03.1985 Claims Search / examination 2
28.03.1985 Description Search / examination 20
28.03.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.1985 Drawings Search / examination 4
28.03.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
28.03.1985 Priority document Search / examination 39
28.03.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10