blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0157622

EP0157622 - Improved clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.1988
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BROADAKER CO. LIMITED
Church Road St. Sampsons Guernsey
Channel Islands / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/41]For all designated states
BROADAKER CO. LIMITED
Church Road
St. Sampsons Guernsey Channel Islands / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Whitaker, Richard Jeffrey
Church Road
St. Sampsons Guernsey Channel Islands / GB
[1985/41]
Representative(s)Boydell, John Christopher, et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn
London EC1N 2JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/41]Boydell, John Christopher, et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street
London EC4Y 1LL / GB
Application number, filing date85302260.601.04.1985
[1985/41]
Priority number, dateGB1984000847202.04.1984         Original published format: GB 8408472
[1985/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0157622
Date:09.10.1985
Language:EN
[1985/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.1985
ClassificationIPC:A47B81/06
[1985/41]
CPC:
A47B81/061 (EP); F16B2/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/41]
TitleGerman:Klemmvorrichtung[1985/41]
English:Improved clamping device[1985/41]
French:Dispositif de serrage[1985/41]
File destroyed:16.08.1994
Examination procedure02.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/23]
31.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.1988Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/28]
11.02.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1988/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1269311  ;
 [Y]DE2007583  ;
 [Y]DE1962175  ;
 [Y]DE7019988U  ;
 [Y]DE7343714U  ;
 [Y]FR2166619  ;
 [Y]FR2367450  ;
 [Y]FR2374868  ;
 [Y]FR2388528  ;
 [Y]FR2452898
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.