blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0161816

EP0161816 - Urogastrone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
For all designated states
G D SEARLE & CO LTD
PO Box 53 Lane End Road High Wycombe
Bucks HP12 4HL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]For all designated states
IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC
Imperial Chemical House, Millbank
London SW1P 3JF / GB
For all designated states
G D SEARLE & CO LTD
PO Box 53 Lane End Road
High Wycombe Bucks HP12 4HL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Gregory, Harold
Mereside Alderley Park
Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB
02 / McCullagh, Keith Graham
Windrush House 30 Manor Park
Princes Risborough Buckinghamshire / GB
[1985/47]
Representative(s)Mack, John Richard, et al
ICI Group Patents Services Dept.
PO Box 6
Shire Park
Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]Mack, John Richard, et al
ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road
Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB
Application number, filing date85302653.216.04.1985
[1985/47]
Priority number, dateGB1984000996117.04.1984         Original published format: GB 8409961
[1985/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0161816
Date:21.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0161816
Date:18.12.1985
Language:EN
[1985/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1985
ClassificationIPC:A61K37/24, A61K35/22
[1985/47]
CPC:
A61K38/1808 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP)
C-Set:
A61K38/1808, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/225 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/415 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/425 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/557 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K38/1808, A61K33/08 (EP)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1985/47]
TitleGerman:Urogastrone[1985/47]
English:Urogastrone[1985/47]
French:Urogastrone[1985/47]
File destroyed:14.06.1996
Examination procedure20.05.1986Examination requested  [1986/29]
15.01.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/34]
29.03.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1990/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]GB1394846  (ICI LTD)
 [X]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 18, no. 3, March 1966, pages 20-24; Chatham New Jersey, US;
 [X]  - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 20, no. 5, May 1968, pages 65-77, Chatham, New Jersey, US;
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.