Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0162609

EP0162609 - Preparation of zeolite ZSM-12 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.1989
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.1990 [1990/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street New York
New York 10017 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/48]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
150 East 42nd Street
New York New York 10017 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rubin, Mae Koenig
50 Belmont Avenue
Bala Cynwyd Pa. 19004 / US
[1985/48]
Representative(s)Carpmael, John William Maurice , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[1988/12]
Former [1985/48]Grundy, Derek George Ritchie
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date85302942.926.04.1985
[1985/48]
Priority number, dateUS1984061407125.05.1984         Original published format: US 614071
[1985/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0162609
Date:27.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0162609
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0162609
Date:11.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1986
ClassificationInternational:C01B33/28
[1985/48]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1985/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zeolith ZSM-12[1985/48]
English:Preparation of zeolite ZSM-12[1985/48]
French:Procédé de préparation de zéolite ZSM-12[1985/48]
Examination procedure13.03.1987Examination requested  [1987/20]
14.01.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1988Fee for grant paid
23.07.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.10.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0002079  ;
 [A]US3699139  ;
 [AD]US4391785  ;
 [AD]US3832449