Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0164215

EP0164215 - Gas fluidised bed terpolymerisation of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BP Chemicals Limited
Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road
London, SW1W 0SU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/50]For all designated states
BP Chemicals Limited
Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road
London, SW1W 0SU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Durand, Daniel Claude BP Chemicals Limited
Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road
London, SW1W OSU / GB
02 / Morterol, Frederic Robert Marie Michel BP Chimie
Lavera Refinery Boite Postale 1
F-13117 Lavera / FR
[1985/50]
Representative(s)Denbigh, Keith Warwick , et al
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/44]Denbigh, Keith Warwick , et al
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB
Former [1985/50]Delgrange, Jean Paul Maurice Emile
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents Division Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date85303077.330.04.1985
[1985/50]
Priority number, dateFR1984000677302.05.1984         Original published format: FR 8406773
[1985/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0164215
Date:11.12.1985
Language:EN
[1985/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0164215
Date:23.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0164215
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.1985
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/34, C08F210/16, C08F297/08
[1985/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1985/50]
TitleGerman:Terpolymerisierung von Olefinen in Gasphase beim Wirbelbettverfahren[1985/50]
English:Gas fluidised bed terpolymerisation of olefins[1985/50]
French:Terpolymérisation d'oléfines en lit fluidisé et en phase gazeuse[1985/50]
Examination procedure28.04.1986Examination requested  [1986/28]
16.11.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.12.1988Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
26.01.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.1989Fee for grant paid
13.03.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.05.1990  09.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastics Company Inc.
Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.1990  09.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastics Company Inc.
Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Opponent's representative
Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1995/27]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.1990  09.07.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastics Company Inc.
Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Opponent's representative
Allard, Susan Joyce
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1990/29]
Opponent(s)01  22.05.1990   
Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastics Company Inc.
Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Opponent's representative
Baverstock, Michael George Douglas
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
11.07.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.01.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.1992Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.10.1993Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1994Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
09.05.1995Date of oral proceedings
18.05.1995Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.1995Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
27.10.1999Date of oral proceedings
05.11.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.11.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.06.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.07.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.08.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.01.2000Appeal received No.  T0034/00
29.02.2000Statement of grounds filed
12.06.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.07.1995Appeal received No.  T0573/95
18.09.1995Statement of grounds filed
22.07.1998Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
22.07.1998Date of oral proceedings
28.07.1998Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:24.12.1988Request for further processing filed
24.12.1988Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.01.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.04.1994
LI30.04.1994
[1995/11]
Documents cited:Search[A]JP58008711  ;
 [A]FR21605  ;
 [A]FR2442865  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  - JAPANESE PATENT GAZETTE, week K08, 6th April 1983, page 18, Derwent Publications, London, GB; & JP - A - 58 008 711 (ASAHI) 18-01-1983, & JP58008711 A 00000000
OppositionFR21605
 GB2036764
 GB2006232
 EP0095848
 US4205021
 US4021599
 FR2442865
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Technology, J. Wiley & Sons, 1968, Vol. 9, pp. 47, 48, 118, 119
    - Polymer Science U.S.S.R., Pergamon Press, 1980, Vol. 22, pp. 448-454