Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0164215 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0164215



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 709
19.09.2002 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
19.09.2002 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.09.2002 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
23.08.2002 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
23.08.2002 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
23.08.2002 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
02.07.2002 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
02.07.2002 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
02.07.2002 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
26.06.2002 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
25.06.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.06.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.06.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 32
06.05.2002 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.2002 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
06.05.2002 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
24.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.04.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.04.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.02.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.01.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
25.01.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
23.01.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.05.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
19.02.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
22.09.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.09.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.09.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
04.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.07.2000 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
29.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
08.03.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.02.2000 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.02.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
21.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
21.02.2000 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
18.02.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.02.2000 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.01.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.01.2000 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.01.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
11.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
05.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
05.11.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
05.11.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
05.11.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
05.11.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
05.11.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
05.11.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.11.1999 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.11.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 18
24.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.09.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.08.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.08.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
19.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.04.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.03.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.03.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.03.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
19.03.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
12.03.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.03.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.02.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
26.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.1999 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.09.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.07.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.07.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.07.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.07.1998 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
22.07.1998 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
22.07.1998 General authorisation Appeal 1
20.07.1998 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
17.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.07.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.07.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.03.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
25.03.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
25.03.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.03.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.03.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.03.1998 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
16.03.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.02.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.02.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
29.01.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.01.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
29.09.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.09.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.09.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.09.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
03.08.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
24.07.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.07.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
10.07.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.05.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.05.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
18.05.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
18.05.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
18.05.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
18.05.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.05.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
11.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.05.1995 Claims Opposition 4
02.05.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.1995 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
10.10.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.10.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.09.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
29.09.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
29.09.1994 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.09.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.09.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.09.1994 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
13.09.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.1994 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.09.1994 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.03.1994 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
03.03.1994 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
20.12.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.12.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.1993 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.10.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
13.09.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
12.05.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
12.05.1993 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
11.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Claims Opposition 1
03.05.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.04.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.10.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
23.10.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
09.06.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.1992 Claims Opposition 4
29.04.1992 Claims Opposition 4
29.04.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
27.04.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 16
12.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 9
27.02.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 11
26.02.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.02.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.11.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
21.11.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.11.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.11.1991 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
22.10.1991 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
22.10.1991 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.01.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.1991 Claims Opposition 4
17.01.1991 Description Opposition 2
17.01.1991 Description Opposition 2
17.01.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
03.12.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.11.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.11.1990 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.07.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.07.1990 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.06.1990 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.06.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.06.1990 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.05.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
22.05.1990 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.05.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 25
25.08.1989 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.07.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
13.03.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.03.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
13.03.1989 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
26.01.1989 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.01.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
24.12.1988 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
09.12.1988 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Search / examination 3
03.12.1988 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.06.1988 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.06.1988 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
03.05.1988 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
09.03.1988 Annex Search / examination 9
09.03.1988 Claims Search / examination 4
09.03.1988 Claims Search / examination 4
09.03.1988 Description Search / examination 3
09.03.1988 Description Search / examination 3
09.03.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
09.03.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.11.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.08.1987 Deletion of the entry relating to the representative (general authorisation) Search / examination 1
21.10.1985 Refund of (partial) search fee Search / examination 1
18.10.1985 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.10.1985 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.10.1985 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.10.1985 European search report Search / examination 2
25.06.1985 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.06.1985 Priority document Search / examination 21
30.04.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.1985 Claims Search / examination 4
30.04.1985 Description Search / examination 28
30.04.1985 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.04.1985 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
30.04.1985 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11