blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0161941

EP0161941 - Monoclonal antibody useful in the diagnosis of human stomach or breast cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1993
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.07.1993 [1993/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Tokyo Fujimi Bldg. 11-2 Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102 / JP
For all designated states
Hirohashi, Setsuo
5-6 Goban-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Shimosato, Yukio
4-26-1 Minami-Ogikubo Suginami-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Watanabe, Masahiko
2-7-4 Minami-Tokiwadai Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]For all designated states
NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Tokyo Fujimi Bldg. 11-2 Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102 / JP
For all designated states
Hirohashi, Setsuo
5-6 Goban-cho
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Shimosato, Yukio
4-26-1 Minami-Ogikubo
Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Watanabe, Masahiko
2-7-4 Minami-Tokiwadai
Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirohashi, Setsuo
5-6 Goban-cho
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
02 / Shimosato, Yukio
4-26-1 Minami-Ogikubo
Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP
03 / Watanabe, Masahiko
2-7-4 Minami-Tokiwadai
Itabashi-ku Tokyo / JP
[1985/47]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/47]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date85303481.717.05.1985
[1985/47]
Priority number, dateJP1984009754917.05.1984         Original published format: JP 9754984
JP1984010176922.05.1984         Original published format: JP 10176984
[1985/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0161941
Date:21.11.1985
Language:EN
[1985/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0161941
Date:05.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0161941
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:C12P21/00, C12N15/00, G01N33/577, G01N33/574, // C12N5/00 ,(C12P21/00, C12R1:91)
[1985/47]
CPC:
C07K16/3046 (EP,US); C12N5/16 (KR); C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/3015 (EP,US); Y10S435/948 (EP,US); Y10S530/864 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1985/47]
TitleGerman:Zur Diagnose von menschlichem Magen- oder Brustkrebs zu verwendender monoklonaler Antikörper[1985/47]
English:Monoclonal antibody useful in the diagnosis of human stomach or breast cancer[1985/47]
French:Anticorps monoclonal utilisable dans le diagnostic du cancer de l'estomac ou du sein humain[1985/47]
Examination procedure03.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/05]
22.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.02.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.1992Fee for grant paid
07.05.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
16.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]AU21726B  ;
 [YP]EP0119556  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US])
 [XP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 19, 13th May 1985, page 468, abstract no. 164975x, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. HIROHASHI et al.: "Carbohydrate antigen defined by a monoclonal antibody raised against a gastric cancer xenograft", & JPN. J. CANCER. RES. (GANN) 1985, 76(1), 43-52
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.