Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0166574

EP0166574 - Fetal blood sampling instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.1991
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.1991 [1991/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dombrowski, Mitchell P., M.D.
103 Mapleton Grosse Pointe Farms
Michigan 48236 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/01]For all designated states
Dombrowski, Mitchell P., M.D.
103 Mapleton
Grosse Pointe Farms Michigan 48236 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1986/01]
Representative(s)Orr, William McLean , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds
LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/14]Orr, William McLean , et al
URQUHART-DYKES & LORD 5th Floor, Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds West Yorkshire, LS2 8PA / GB
Former [1986/01]Meeks, Frank Burton
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 47 Marylebone Lane
London W1M 6DL / GB
Application number, filing date85304411.320.06.1985
[1986/01]
Priority number, dateUS1984062573828.06.1984         Original published format: US 625738
US1984067923307.12.1984         Original published format: US 679233
[1986/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0166574
Date:02.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0166574
Date:16.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/14
[1986/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/01]
TitleGerman:Instrument zur Fetal-Blutentnahme[1986/01]
English:Fetal blood sampling instrument[1986/01]
French:Instrument de prélèvement du sang foetal[1986/01]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure27.11.1987Examination requested  [1988/04]
07.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.06.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/14]
06.11.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1991/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:SearchUS4441510  [ ] (WORLEY MICHAEL W [US], et al);
 US4360016  [ ] (SARRINE ROBERT J);
 WO8204387  [ ] (MALCOLM DAVID H [US], et al);
 US4373535  [ ] (MARTELL MICHAEL D [US])