Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0171168

EP0171168 - Nonionic surfactant treated clays, methods of making same, water-based paints, organic solvent-based paints and paper coatings containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.1992
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.1993 [1993/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENGELHARD CORPORATION
70 Wood Avenue South CN 770 Iselin
New Jersey 08830 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/07]For all designated states
ENGELHARD CORPORATION
70 Wood Avenue South CN 770
Iselin New Jersey 08830 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dixon, Dan M.
P.O. Box 362
Gordon Georgia 31031 / US
02 / Drexel, Richard J.
P.O. Box 121
Irwinton Georgia 31042 / US
[1986/07]
Representative(s)Geering, Keith Edwin , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/07]Geering, Keith Edwin , et al
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date85304659.728.06.1985
[1986/07]
Priority number, dateUS1984062960611.07.1984         Original published format: US 629606
[1986/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0171168
Date:12.02.1986
Language:EN
[1986/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0171168
Date:16.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0171168
Date:22.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.1987
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/42, C09D7/12, C09C3/08, D21H19/00
[1992/04]
Former International [1987/36]C09C1/42, C09D7/12, D21H1/22, C09C3/08
Former International [1986/07]C09C1/42, C09D7/12, D21H1/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1986/07]
TitleGerman:Mit anionischen oberflächenaktiven Mitteln behandelte Tone, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, Anstrichfarben auf Basis von Wasser oder organischen Lösungsmitteln und Papierüberzüge welche diese enthalten[1986/07]
English:Nonionic surfactant treated clays, methods of making same, water-based paints, organic solvent-based paints and paper coatings containing same[1986/07]
French:Argiles traitées par des surfactifs anioniques, procédé de préparation, peintures à base d'eau ou de solvants organiques et revêtements pour papiers les contenant[1986/07]
Examination procedure11.03.1988Examination requested  [1988/18]
28.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.1991Fee for grant paid
22.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.06.1992
[1992/46]
Documents cited:Search[X]US3804656  (KALISKI A, et al);
 [A]FR2187865  (HUBER CORP J M [US]);
 [A]FR2289586  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH])